THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:20:02 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2012
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Owen Sound Family Health Team
1415 First Avenue West
Owen Sound Ontario N4K 4K8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 470-3030
Fax: 519-370-4045

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 23 Jun 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 23 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Anastasia Marie Blake Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Mar 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Blake (CPSO#: 98377 )
Business Address: Owen Sound Family Health Team
Suite 2000
1415 First Avenue West
Owen Sound Ontario N4K 4K8
(519) 470-3030

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Owen Sound Family Health Team
1415 First Avenue West
Owen Sound Ontario N4K 4K8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 470-3030
Fax: 519-370-4045

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 23 Jun 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 23 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Anastasia Marie Blake Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Mar 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Blake (CPSO#: 98377 )
Business Address: Owen Sound Family Health Team
Suite 2000
1415 First Avenue West
Owen Sound Ontario N4K 4K8
(519) 470-3030

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANASTASIA MARIE BLAKE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BLAKE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANASTASIA MARIE BLAKE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BLAKE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Sep 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Sep 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012