THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
11/05/25 05:20:07 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2012
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Mount Sinai Hospital - Suite 206
600 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 586-5058
Fax: 416-586-4719
Address: North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto Ontario M2K 1E1
Phone: 416-756-6000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 23 Jun 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 23 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Aaron Horvath Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Oct 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Horvath (CPSO#: 98390 )
Business Address: Mount Sinai Hospital
Joseph and Wolf Lebovic Health Complex
Suite 206
600 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
(416) 586-5058
Business Address: 4001 Leslie Street
North York Ontario M2K 1E1
(416) 756-6000

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Mount Sinai Hospital - Suite 206
600 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 586-5058
Fax: 416-586-4719
Address: North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto Ontario M2K 1E1
Phone: 416-756-6000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 23 Jun 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 23 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Aaron Horvath Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Oct 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Horvath (CPSO#: 98390 )
Business Address: Mount Sinai Hospital
Joseph and Wolf Lebovic Health Complex
Suite 206
600 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
(416) 586-5058
Business Address: 4001 Leslie Street
North York Ontario M2K 1E1
(416) 756-6000

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AARON ISAAC HORVATH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HORVATH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AARON ISAAC HORVATH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HORVATH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Mar 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Mar 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012