THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:05:53 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2012
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Ardelt medical clinic
155 Ardelt ave
Kitchener Ontario N2C 2E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 741-1717
Fax: (226)-475-0114

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Dec 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 16 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Janie Penhearow Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Nov 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Penhearow (CPSO#: 98396 )
Business Address: 155 Ardelt Avenue
Kitchener Ontario N2C 2E1
(519) 741-1717

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Ardelt medical clinic
155 Ardelt ave
Kitchener Ontario N2C 2E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 741-1717
Fax: (226)-475-0114

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Dec 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 16 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Janie Penhearow Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Nov 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Penhearow (CPSO#: 98396 )
Business Address: 155 Ardelt Avenue
Kitchener Ontario N2C 2E1
(519) 741-1717

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JANIE CATHERINE PENHEAROW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PENHEAROW is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JANIE CATHERINE PENHEAROW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PENHEAROW is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 13 Jan 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jan 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 13 Jan 2015

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jan 2015

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2014
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2014

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012