THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:17:33 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Wayne State University School of Medicine, 2012
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 75 Bruyère Street
Ottawa Ontario K1N 5C9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-241-3344
Fax: 613-241-2755

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Bruyere Continuing Care Ottawa
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
HOSPITAL: Bruyere Continuing Care
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mehvish Mehrani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Apr 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Mehrani (CPSO#: 98419 )
Business Address: 75 Bruyère St
Ottawa ON K1N 5C7
613-241-3344
Business Address: 324 Prince Edward Drive South
Unit 2
Toronto Ontario M8Y 3Z5
(647) 345-3048

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Wayne State University School of Medicine, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 75 Bruyère Street
Ottawa Ontario K1N 5C9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-241-3344
Fax: 613-241-2755

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Bruyere Continuing Care Ottawa
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
HOSPITAL: Bruyere Continuing Care
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mehvish Mehrani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Apr 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Mehrani (CPSO#: 98419 )
Business Address: 75 Bruyère St
Ottawa ON K1N 5C7
613-241-3344
Business Address: 324 Prince Edward Drive South
Unit 2
Toronto Ontario M8Y 3Z5
(647) 345-3048

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MEHVISH MEHRANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MEHRANI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MEHVISH MEHRANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MEHRANI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Wayne State University School of Medicine, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jun 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012