THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 06:43:48 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2012
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Department of Emergency Medicine
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 798-5555
Extension: 19022
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Francis Memorial Hospital Barry's Bay
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: St Francis Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Barry's Bay

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ali Shahbaz Syed Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Jan 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Syed (CPSO#: 98435 )
Business Address: The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Department of Emergency Medicine
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
(613) 798-5555 Extn: 19022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Department of Emergency Medicine
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 798-5555
Extension: 19022
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Francis Memorial Hospital Barry's Bay
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: St Francis Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Barry's Bay

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ali Shahbaz Syed Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Jan 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Syed (CPSO#: 98435 )
Business Address: The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Department of Emergency Medicine
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
(613) 798-5555 Extn: 19022

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALI SHAHBAZ SYED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SYED is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALI SHAHBAZ SYED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SYED is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Calgary, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 01 Jul 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 29 Jul 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2017

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2017

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 29 Jul 2015

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 29 Jul 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012