THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:45:26 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Academy of Medicine, Lodz, 2011
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Victoria Hospital
Emergency Department
Room E1-105
800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5196858500
Extension: 57956
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Four Counties Health Services Newbury
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre London
HOSPITAL: Four Counties Health Services
LOCATION: Newbury

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: G. Ghate Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Jul 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Ghate (CPSO#: 98454 )
Business Address: Victoria Hospital
Emergency Department
Room E1 - 105
800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
(519) 685-8500 Extn: 57956

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Academy of Medicine, Lodz, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Victoria Hospital
Emergency Department
Room E1-105
800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5196858500
Extension: 57956
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Four Counties Health Services Newbury
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre London
HOSPITAL: Four Counties Health Services
LOCATION: Newbury

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: G. Ghate Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Jul 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Ghate (CPSO#: 98454 )
Business Address: Victoria Hospital
Emergency Department
Room E1 - 105
800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
(519) 685-8500 Extn: 57956

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GAURI GHATE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GHATE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GAURI GHATE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GHATE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Academy of Medicine, Lodz, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2017

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Sep 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012