THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:18:25 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2012
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 9-105 Progress Cres
General Surgery Office
Kapuskasing ON P5N 3J4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-335-5115
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 07 Sep 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 07 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Burundi
Madagascar
Togo

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hopital Notre-Dame Hospital (Hearst) Hearst
Sensenbrenner Hospital Kapuskasing
HOSPITAL: Hopital Notre-Dame Hospital (Hearst)
LOCATION: Hearst

HOSPITAL: Sensenbrenner Hospital
LOCATION: Kapuskasing

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jeshiah A Thiessen Medical Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Apr 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Thiessen (CPSO#: 98459 )
Business Address: 9-105 Progress Crescent
Kapuskasing Ontario P5N 3J4

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 9-105 Progress Cres
General Surgery Office
Kapuskasing ON P5N 3J4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-335-5115
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 07 Sep 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 07 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Burundi
Madagascar
Togo

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hopital Notre-Dame Hospital (Hearst) Hearst
Sensenbrenner Hospital Kapuskasing
HOSPITAL: Hopital Notre-Dame Hospital (Hearst)
LOCATION: Hearst

HOSPITAL: Sensenbrenner Hospital
LOCATION: Kapuskasing

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jeshiah A Thiessen Medical Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Apr 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Thiessen (CPSO#: 98459 )
Business Address: 9-105 Progress Crescent
Kapuskasing Ontario P5N 3J4

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JESHIAH ALAN THIESSEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THIESSEN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JESHIAH ALAN THIESSEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THIESSEN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Calgary, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Sep 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Sep 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012