THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:54:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2012
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 885 Prete Street
Sudbury Ontario P3E 3X9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 586-3601
Fax: 705-586-3602
Address: 40 Elm Street
NEOMO
Medical
Unit 275
Greater Sudbury Ontario P3C 1S8
Phone: 705-586-3601
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Sep 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 18 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Continuing Care Centre Sudbury Sudbury
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Continuing Care Centre Sudbury
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sophie Gervais Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Nov 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Gervais (CPSO#: 98480 )
Business Address: 885 Prete Street
Sudbury Ontario P3E 3X9
(705) 586-3601
Business Address: 275-40 Elm Street
Greater Sudbury Ontario P3C
705-586-3601

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 885 Prete Street
Sudbury Ontario P3E 3X9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 586-3601
Fax: 705-586-3602
Address: 40 Elm Street
NEOMO
Medical
Unit 275
Greater Sudbury Ontario P3C 1S8
Phone: 705-586-3601
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Sep 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 18 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Continuing Care Centre Sudbury Sudbury
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Continuing Care Centre Sudbury
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sophie Gervais Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Nov 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Gervais (CPSO#: 98480 )
Business Address: 885 Prete Street
Sudbury Ontario P3E 3X9
(705) 586-3601
Business Address: 275-40 Elm Street
Greater Sudbury Ontario P3C
705-586-3601

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SOPHIE THERESE GERVAIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GERVAIS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SOPHIE THERESE GERVAIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GERVAIS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Sep 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012