THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 04:12:49 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2012
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 30 The Queensway
St. Joseph's Health Centre
Family Medicine Clinic
Toronto ON M6R 1B5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4165306860
Fax: 4165306160
Address: 30 The Queensway
St. Joseph's Health Centre
Department of Psychiatry
Toronto ON M6R 1B5
Phone: 416-530-6000
Fax: 416-530-6076

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 23 Jun 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 23 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: N Shah Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Apr 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Shah (CPSO#: 98494 )
Business Address: 30 The Queensway
St. Joseph's Health Centre
Department of Psychiatry
Toronto ON M6R 1B5
Business Address: Sherbourne Health Centre
333 Sherbourne Street
Toronto Ontario M5A 2S5
(416) 324-4100

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 30 The Queensway
St. Joseph's Health Centre
Family Medicine Clinic
Toronto ON M6R 1B5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4165306860
Fax: 4165306160
Address: 30 The Queensway
St. Joseph's Health Centre
Department of Psychiatry
Toronto ON M6R 1B5
Phone: 416-530-6000
Fax: 416-530-6076

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 23 Jun 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 23 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: N Shah Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Apr 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Shah (CPSO#: 98494 )
Business Address: 30 The Queensway
St. Joseph's Health Centre
Department of Psychiatry
Toronto ON M6R 1B5
Business Address: Sherbourne Health Centre
333 Sherbourne Street
Toronto Ontario M5A 2S5
(416) 324-4100

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NIKHIL SHAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NIKHIL SHAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Calgary, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jun 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012