THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
28/04/25 06:18:36 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2012
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 300 G Fourth Ave., Suite 201
St. Catharines Ontario L2S 0E6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 289-606-1333
Fax: 289-606-1331

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site St Catharines
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Matthew Zulys Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Mar 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Zulys (CPSO#: 98501 )
Business Address: 201-300G Fourth Ave
St Catharines ON L2S 0E6
2896061333

Corporation Name: Dr. V. Zulys Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 01 Apr 2016

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 300 G Fourth Ave., Suite 201
St. Catharines Ontario L2S 0E6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 289-606-1333
Fax: 289-606-1331

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site St Catharines
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Matthew Zulys Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Mar 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Zulys (CPSO#: 98501 )
Business Address: 201-300G Fourth Ave
St Catharines ON L2S 0E6
2896061333

Corporation Name: Dr. V. Zulys Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 01 Apr 2016

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MATTHEW ZULYS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZULYS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MATTHEW ZULYS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZULYS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012