THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 08:31:55 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicine, 2000
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Mount Sinai Hospital
Division of Rheumatology
Room 2-029
60 Murray Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 3L9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 586-4800
Extension: 5332
Fax: (647) 689-7593

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 06 Feb 2025
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Rheumatology
Effective: 01 Jul 2019
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 06 2025
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Libya
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. AHMED H. OMAR MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Dec 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Omar (CPSO#: 98520 )
Business Address: 60 Murray St
Room L2-29
Toronto ON M5T 3L9
416 586 4800 Extn: ext 5332

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicine, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Mount Sinai Hospital
Division of Rheumatology
Room 2-029
60 Murray Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 3L9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 586-4800
Extension: 5332
Fax: (647) 689-7593

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 06 Feb 2025
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Rheumatology
Effective: 01 Jul 2019
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 06 2025
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Libya
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. AHMED H. OMAR MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Dec 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Omar (CPSO#: 98520 )
Business Address: 60 Murray St
Room L2-29
Toronto ON M5T 3L9
416 586 4800 Extn: ext 5332

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
06 Feb 2025
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Feb 06 2025
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. AHMED HADI ALI OMAR may practise medicine independently in internal medicine and rheumatology.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. AHMED HADI ALI OMAR may practise medicine independently in internal medicine and rheumatology.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicine, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 06 Feb 2025
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2026
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 06 Feb 2025

DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2026

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2018

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012