THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 06:38:08 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Windsor University School of Medicine, 2011
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1 Hospital Court
Emergency Department
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
Oshawa Ontario L1G 2B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 576-8711
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 47 Liberty St. S
Emergency Dept.
Lakeridge Health Bowmanville
Bowmanville Ontario L1C 2N4
Phone: 9056233331
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
New Zealand

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Lakeridge Health Clarington Site Bowmanville
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Clarington Site
LOCATION: Bowmanville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Adam Pyle Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Pyle (CPSO#: 98530 )
Business Address: 73 Regent Park Boulevard
Toronto Ontario M5A 2B7
(416) 864-3022
Business Address: Lakeridge Health Oshawa
Emergency Department
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa Ontario L1G 2B9
(905) 576-8711
Business Address: 47 Liberty Street South
Bowmanville Ontario L1C 2N4
(905) 623-3331

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Windsor University School of Medicine, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1 Hospital Court
Emergency Department
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
Oshawa Ontario L1G 2B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 576-8711
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 47 Liberty St. S
Emergency Dept.
Lakeridge Health Bowmanville
Bowmanville Ontario L1C 2N4
Phone: 9056233331
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
New Zealand

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Lakeridge Health Clarington Site Bowmanville
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Clarington Site
LOCATION: Bowmanville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Adam Pyle Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Pyle (CPSO#: 98530 )
Business Address: 73 Regent Park Boulevard
Toronto Ontario M5A 2B7
(416) 864-3022
Business Address: Lakeridge Health Oshawa
Emergency Department
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa Ontario L1G 2B9
(905) 576-8711
Business Address: 47 Liberty Street South
Bowmanville Ontario L1C 2N4
(905) 623-3331

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ADAM PYLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PYLE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ADAM PYLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PYLE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Windsor University School of Medicine, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jun 2014

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012