THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:12:01 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Baghdad College of Medicine, 1999
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 80 Michael Cowpland Dr
Kanata ON K2M 1P6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-599-3321
Fax: 613-599-3366
Address: Algonquin College Health Services
1385 Woodroffe Ave, Room C141
Ottawa Ontario K2G 1V8
Phone: 613-727-4723
Extension: 7222
Fax: 613-727-3166

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Aug 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 18 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Asaad Al-Hindawi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Sep 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Al-Hindawi (CPSO#: 98534 )
Business Address: 1385 Woodroffe Avenue
Suite C141
Ottawa Ontario K2G 1V8
(613) 727-4723 Extn: 7222
Business Address: 2-80 Michael Cowpland Dr
Kanata ON K2M 1P6

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: University of Baghdad College of Medicine, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 80 Michael Cowpland Dr
Kanata ON K2M 1P6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-599-3321
Fax: 613-599-3366
Address: Algonquin College Health Services
1385 Woodroffe Ave, Room C141
Ottawa Ontario K2G 1V8
Phone: 613-727-4723
Extension: 7222
Fax: 613-727-3166

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Aug 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 18 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Asaad Al-Hindawi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Sep 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Al-Hindawi (CPSO#: 98534 )
Business Address: 1385 Woodroffe Avenue
Suite C141
Ottawa Ontario K2G 1V8
(613) 727-4723 Extn: 7222
Business Address: 2-80 Michael Cowpland Dr
Kanata ON K2M 1P6

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ASAAD ADIL IBRAHIM AL-HINDAWI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL-HINDAWI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ASAAD ADIL IBRAHIM AL-HINDAWI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL-HINDAWI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Baghdad College of Medicine, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Aug 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Aug 2014

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Sep 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012