THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:32:52 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2011
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Niagara Urology Associates
3350 Merrittvillle Highway
Unit #2
Thorold Ontario L2V 4Y6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-641-5556
Extension: ext 5
Fax: 905-641-2261

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Urology
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Urology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site St Catharines
Niagara Health System - Welland Site Welland
Niagara Health System Niagara Falls
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System - Welland Site
LOCATION: Welland

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System
LOCATION: Niagara Falls

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Patrick J. McGarry Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Dec 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. P. McGarry (CPSO#: 98543 )
Business Address: 3350 Merrittville Hwy
Unit 2
Thorold ON L2V 4Y6

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Niagara Urology Associates
3350 Merrittvillle Highway
Unit #2
Thorold Ontario L2V 4Y6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-641-5556
Extension: ext 5
Fax: 905-641-2261

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Urology
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Urology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site St Catharines
Niagara Health System - Welland Site Welland
Niagara Health System Niagara Falls
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System - Welland Site
LOCATION: Welland

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System
LOCATION: Niagara Falls

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Patrick J. McGarry Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Dec 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. P. McGarry (CPSO#: 98543 )
Business Address: 3350 Merrittville Hwy
Unit 2
Thorold ON L2V 4Y6

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PATRICK JOHN MCGARRY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCGARRY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PATRICK JOHN MCGARRY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCGARRY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012