THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
19/05/25 04:11:13 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: National University of Ireland, 2012
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2075 Bayview Avenue
D7-18
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-480-5554
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Washington

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: STEPHANIE A. MASON MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Jul 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Mason (CPSO#: 98545 )
Business Address: 2075 Bayview Ave
Room H171A
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
416-480-5554

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: National University of Ireland, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2075 Bayview Avenue
D7-18
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-480-5554
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Washington

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: STEPHANIE A. MASON MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Jul 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Mason (CPSO#: 98545 )
Business Address: 2075 Bayview Ave
Room H171A
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
416-480-5554

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STEPHANIE AMANDA ANN MASON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MASON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STEPHANIE AMANDA ANN MASON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MASON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: National University of Ireland, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 01 Jul 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 13 May 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 19 Dec 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 19 Dec 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2019

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2017

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 13 May 2015

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 19 Dec 2014

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Dec 2014
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 19 Dec 2014

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012