THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 04:12:48 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 2012
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Ottawa Hospital
Department of Gatroenterology
1053 Carling Ave
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-798-5555
Extension: 82197
Fax: No Information Available
Address: The Ottawa Hospital
Department of Gastroenterology
501 Smyth Rd
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 03 Oct 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 03 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kemptville District Hospital Kemptville
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Arnprior Regional Health Arnprior
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Kemptville District Hospital
LOCATION: Kemptville

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Arnprior Regional Health
LOCATION: Arnprior

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Stephanie D. Canning Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Jan 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Canning (CPSO#: 98563 )
Business Address: Arnprior Regional Health
350 John St. N.
Arnprior Ontario K7S 2P6
Business Address: The Ottawa Hospital
Department of Gastroenterology
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
Business Address: The Ottawa Hospital
Department of Gastroenterology
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa Ontario K1H 7W9
Business Address: The Ottawa Hospital
Department of Gastroenterology
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Ottawa Hospital
Department of Gatroenterology
1053 Carling Ave
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-798-5555
Extension: 82197
Fax: No Information Available
Address: The Ottawa Hospital
Department of Gastroenterology
501 Smyth Rd
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 03 Oct 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 03 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kemptville District Hospital Kemptville
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Arnprior Regional Health Arnprior
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Kemptville District Hospital
LOCATION: Kemptville

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Arnprior Regional Health
LOCATION: Arnprior

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Stephanie D. Canning Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Jan 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Canning (CPSO#: 98563 )
Business Address: Arnprior Regional Health
350 John St. N.
Arnprior Ontario K7S 2P6
Business Address: The Ottawa Hospital
Department of Gastroenterology
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
Business Address: The Ottawa Hospital
Department of Gastroenterology
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa Ontario K1H 7W9
Business Address: The Ottawa Hospital
Department of Gastroenterology
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STEPHANIE DENISE CANNING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CANNING is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STEPHANIE DENISE CANNING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CANNING is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Oct 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Oct 2016

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Sep 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012