THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:20:11 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2012
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2-34 Civic Avenue
Stouffville Ontario L4A 1H2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 640-3100
Fax: (905) 640-5346

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kimberley Charlton Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Aug 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Charlton (CPSO#: 98566 )
Business Address: 2 - 34 Civic Avenue
Stouffville Ontario L4A 1H2
(905) 640-3100

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2-34 Civic Avenue
Stouffville Ontario L4A 1H2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 640-3100
Fax: (905) 640-5346

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kimberley Charlton Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Aug 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Charlton (CPSO#: 98566 )
Business Address: 2 - 34 Civic Avenue
Stouffville Ontario L4A 1H2
(905) 640-3100

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KIMBERLEY ELIZABETH CHARLTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHARLTON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KIMBERLEY ELIZABETH CHARLTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHARLTON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jun 2014

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012