THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 05:20:37 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Gujarat University, 2009
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GUJARATI, HINDI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 30 Bond St
St. Michael's Hospital (6th floor - Neurology Clinic)
Toronto ON M5B 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4168645056
Fax: 4168645712

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: MV VYAS MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Jun 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Vyas (CPSO#: 98570 )
Business Address: 30 Bond St
NEUROLOGY CLINIC
6TH FLOOR
Toronto ON M5B 1W8
4168645056

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GUJARATI, HINDI
Medical School: Gujarat University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 30 Bond St
St. Michael's Hospital (6th floor - Neurology Clinic)
Toronto ON M5B 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4168645056
Fax: 4168645712

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: MV VYAS MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Jun 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Vyas (CPSO#: 98570 )
Business Address: 30 Bond St
NEUROLOGY CLINIC
6TH FLOOR
Toronto ON M5B 1W8
4168645056

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MANAV VIRATBHAI VYAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VYAS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MANAV VIRATBHAI VYAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VYAS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Gujarat University, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2017

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012