THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
21/05/25 03:13:46 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2012
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Hamilton Health Sciences
Juravinski Hospital, ICU Level 0
711 Concession Street
Hamilton Ontario L8V 1C3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 521 2100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 02 Oct 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Gastroenterology
Effective: 03 Oct 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 02 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 03 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. JOANNA DIONNE MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Oct 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Dionne (CPSO#: 98573 )
Business Address: 711 Concession St
Room A3-75
Hamilton ON L8V 1C3
9055212100

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Hamilton Health Sciences
Juravinski Hospital, ICU Level 0
711 Concession Street
Hamilton Ontario L8V 1C3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 521 2100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 02 Oct 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Gastroenterology
Effective: 03 Oct 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 02 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 03 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. JOANNA DIONNE MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Oct 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Dionne (CPSO#: 98573 )
Business Address: 711 Concession St
Room A3-75
Hamilton ON L8V 1C3
9055212100

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOANNA COLLEEN DIONNE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DIONNE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOANNA COLLEEN DIONNE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DIONNE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Jun 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012