THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/05/25 04:17:41 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2012
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Trillium Health Partners
Mississauga Hospital
100 Queensway Hospital
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 848-7100
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Joseph Brant Hospital
1245 Lakeshore Road
Burlington, ON L7S 0A2
Burlington Ontario L7S 0A2
Phone: 905-599-5852
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 27 Sep 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Joseph Brant Hospital
LOCATION: Burlington

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Shaikh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 May 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Shaikh (CPSO#: 98574 )
Business Address: Joesph Brant Hospital
1245 Lakeshore Road
Burlington Ontario L7S 0A2
(905) 681-4812
Business Address: Trillium Health Partners
Mississauga Hospital
100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
(905) 848-7100

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Trillium Health Partners
Mississauga Hospital
100 Queensway Hospital
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 848-7100
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Joseph Brant Hospital
1245 Lakeshore Road
Burlington, ON L7S 0A2
Burlington Ontario L7S 0A2
Phone: 905-599-5852
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 27 Sep 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Joseph Brant Hospital
LOCATION: Burlington

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Shaikh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 May 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Shaikh (CPSO#: 98574 )
Business Address: Joesph Brant Hospital
1245 Lakeshore Road
Burlington Ontario L7S 0A2
(905) 681-4812
Business Address: Trillium Health Partners
Mississauga Hospital
100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
(905) 848-7100

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAMEER YASIN SHAIKH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAIKH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAMEER YASIN SHAIKH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAIKH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 01 Jul 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jul 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2017

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2017

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Jul 2015

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jul 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012