THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 04:20:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2012
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Division of Emergency Medicine
LHSC - VH Room E1 - 102
800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 667-6538
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 4100 Yonge St
North York ON M2P 2B5
Phone: 1-877-280-8538
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 22 Dec 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 03 Jul 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 22 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 03 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre London
South Bruce Grey Health Centre Walkerton
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
Alexandra Hospital Ingersoll
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: South Bruce Grey Health Centre
LOCATION: Walkerton

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: Alexandra Hospital
LOCATION: Ingersoll

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Frank E Myslik Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Aug 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Myslik (CPSO#: 98576 )
Business Address: 800 Commissioners Road East
Suite E1-102
London Ontario N6A 5W9
(519) 667-6538

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Division of Emergency Medicine
LHSC - VH Room E1 - 102
800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 667-6538
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 4100 Yonge St
North York ON M2P 2B5
Phone: 1-877-280-8538
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 22 Dec 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 03 Jul 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 22 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 03 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre London
South Bruce Grey Health Centre Walkerton
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
Alexandra Hospital Ingersoll
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: South Bruce Grey Health Centre
LOCATION: Walkerton

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: Alexandra Hospital
LOCATION: Ingersoll

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Frank E Myslik Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Aug 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Myslik (CPSO#: 98576 )
Business Address: 800 Commissioners Road East
Suite E1-102
London Ontario N6A 5W9
(519) 667-6538

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FRANK ERNEST MYSLIK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MYSLIK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FRANK ERNEST MYSLIK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MYSLIK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Jul 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012