THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:46:26 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2012
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, POLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 581 Davis Drive
Medical Arts Building
101
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-989-1814
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1188B Eglington Avenue West
Toronto Ontario M6C2E3
Phone: (416)785-7864
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Plastic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Plastic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
Oak Valley Health Markham
HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Victoria Hayward Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Jul 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Hayward (CPSO#: 98612 )
Business Address: 101 - 581 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P6

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, POLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 581 Davis Drive
Medical Arts Building
101
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-989-1814
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1188B Eglington Avenue West
Toronto Ontario M6C2E3
Phone: (416)785-7864
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Plastic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Plastic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
Oak Valley Health Markham
HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Victoria Hayward Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Jul 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Hayward (CPSO#: 98612 )
Business Address: 101 - 581 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P6

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VICTORIA HAYWARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAYWARD is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VICTORIA HAYWARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAYWARD is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Jun 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012