THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 03:01:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 2012
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 76 Stuart St
Kingston General Hospital
Division of Cardiology
Kidd 3 - CV Lab
Kingston ON K7L 2V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6135481329
Fax: 6135482400

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 18 Oct 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 18 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Oak Valley Health Markham
HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. IAN BRITTON MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Feb 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. I. Britton (CPSO#: 98634 )
Business Address: 76 Stuart St
Kingston General Hospital
Division of Cardiology
Kidd-3 - CV Lab
Kingston ON K7L 2V7
6135481329

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 76 Stuart St
Kingston General Hospital
Division of Cardiology
Kidd 3 - CV Lab
Kingston ON K7L 2V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6135481329
Fax: 6135482400

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 18 Oct 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 18 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Oak Valley Health Markham
HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. IAN BRITTON MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Feb 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. I. Britton (CPSO#: 98634 )
Business Address: 76 Stuart St
Kingston General Hospital
Division of Cardiology
Kidd-3 - CV Lab
Kingston ON K7L 2V7
6135481329

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. IAN ALEXANDER WATSON BRITTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRITTON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. IAN ALEXANDER WATSON BRITTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRITTON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Oct 2016

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012