THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
27/05/25 19:51:42 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University College of Dublin, 2012
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Division of Hematology
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 798-5555
Fax: (613) 737-8861

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematology
Effective: 03 Nov 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 03 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Kennah Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Dec 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Kennah (CPSO#: 98662 )
Business Address: 501 Smyth Rd
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
6137378899

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University College of Dublin, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Division of Hematology
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 798-5555
Fax: (613) 737-8861

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematology
Effective: 03 Nov 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 03 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Kennah Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Dec 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Kennah (CPSO#: 98662 )
Business Address: 501 Smyth Rd
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
6137378899

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL LEE KENNAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KENNAH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL LEE KENNAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KENNAH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University College of Dublin, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Mar 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 23 Sep 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Aug 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Mar 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2016

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Aug 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2015

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012