THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:21:24 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: National University of Ireland, 2012
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 6V4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 807-684-6000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Lake of the Woods District Hospital
21 Sylvan Street
Kenora Ontario P9N 3W7
Phone: (807) 468-9861
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 11 Dec 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 11 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
HOSPITAL: Lake of the Woods District Hospital
LOCATION: Kenora

HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sarah E. Coke Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Mar 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Coke (CPSO#: 98664 )
Business Address: 980 Oliver Rd
Thunder Bay ON P7B 6V4

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: National University of Ireland, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 6V4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 807-684-6000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Lake of the Woods District Hospital
21 Sylvan Street
Kenora Ontario P9N 3W7
Phone: (807) 468-9861
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 11 Dec 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 11 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
HOSPITAL: Lake of the Woods District Hospital
LOCATION: Kenora

HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sarah E. Coke Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Mar 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Coke (CPSO#: 98664 )
Business Address: 980 Oliver Rd
Thunder Bay ON P7B 6V4

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SARAH ELIZABETH COKE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COKE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SARAH ELIZABETH COKE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COKE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: National University of Ireland, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Dec 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 11 Dec 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Dec 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 11 Dec 2016

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012