THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:35:29 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2012
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 116 Albert St
Ottawa ON K1P 5G3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-216-3932
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Dec 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 22 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Medical record requests should be sent to:
210 Centrum Blvd
Orleans, ON
K1E 3V7
Phone: 613-837-5454
Date Received: 02 May 2023

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mariem Malak Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Jan 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Malak (CPSO#: 98670 )
Business Address: 116 Albert St
Ottawa ON K1P 5G3

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ARABIC
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 116 Albert St
Ottawa ON K1P 5G3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-216-3932
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Dec 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 22 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Medical record requests should be sent to:
210 Centrum Blvd
Orleans, ON
K1E 3V7
Phone: 613-837-5454
Date Received: 02 May 2023

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mariem Malak Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Jan 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Malak (CPSO#: 98670 )
Business Address: 116 Albert St
Ottawa ON K1P 5G3

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARIEM ISABELLE MALAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MALAK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARIEM ISABELLE MALAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MALAK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jan 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 15 Dec 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jan 2015

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 15 Dec 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012