THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:03:07 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2012
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, BENGALI, HINDI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Markham Medical Center
6633 Highway 7 East, Suite 214
Markham, Ontario
Markham Ontario L3P 7P3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 294-2290
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Union Villa Long-Term Care
4300 Highway 7
Markham Ontario L3R 1L8
Phone: 905-477-2839
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Markham Stouffville Hospital
Rehab Unit - 1 East
381 Church Street
Markham, ON
Markham Ontario L3P7P3
Phone: 905-472-7525
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 194 Eagle St
Newmarket Health Center
Newmarket ON L3Y 1J6
Phone: 905-895-3628
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health Markham
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Susmita Esufali Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Apr 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Esufali (CPSO#: 98672 )
Business Address: 6633 Highway 7
Markham Ontario L3P 7P2
9052942290

Corporation Name: Dr. Susmita Esufali Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 18 Mar 2024

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, BENGALI, HINDI
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Markham Medical Center
6633 Highway 7 East, Suite 214
Markham, Ontario
Markham Ontario L3P 7P3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 294-2290
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Union Villa Long-Term Care
4300 Highway 7
Markham Ontario L3R 1L8
Phone: 905-477-2839
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Markham Stouffville Hospital
Rehab Unit - 1 East
381 Church Street
Markham, ON
Markham Ontario L3P7P3
Phone: 905-472-7525
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 194 Eagle St
Newmarket Health Center
Newmarket ON L3Y 1J6
Phone: 905-895-3628
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health Markham
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Susmita Esufali Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Apr 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Esufali (CPSO#: 98672 )
Business Address: 6633 Highway 7
Markham Ontario L3P 7P2
9052942290

Corporation Name: Dr. Susmita Esufali Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 18 Mar 2024

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SUSMITA ESUFALI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ESUFALI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SUSMITA ESUFALI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ESUFALI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 May 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jun 2015

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 May 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012