THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 08:47:56 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Imperial College School of Medicine, 2012
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Paediatric
Emergency Medicine
555 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 813-1500
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1440 Bathurst St.
Toronto, ON
Toronto Ontario M5R 3J3
Phone: (416) 654-5437
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatric Emergency Medicine
Effective: 15 Jan 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 31 Dec 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatric Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 15 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 31 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: F. Razik Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Jun 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Razik (CPSO#: 98676 )
Business Address: 555 University Ave
Toronto ON M5G 1X8
416-813-1500

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Imperial College School of Medicine, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Paediatric
Emergency Medicine
555 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 813-1500
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1440 Bathurst St.
Toronto, ON
Toronto Ontario M5R 3J3
Phone: (416) 654-5437
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatric Emergency Medicine
Effective: 15 Jan 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 31 Dec 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatric Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 15 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 31 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: F. Razik Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Jun 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Razik (CPSO#: 98676 )
Business Address: 555 University Ave
Toronto ON M5G 1X8
416-813-1500

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FATHIMA SALY ABDUL RAZIK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAZIK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FATHIMA SALY ABDUL RAZIK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAZIK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Imperial College School of Medicine, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Dec 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 02 Dec 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 02 Dec 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 2016

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2015

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 02 Dec 2014

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Dec 2014
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 02 Dec 2014

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012