THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
12/05/25 03:33:20 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2012
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 580 Harwood Ave S
Ajax ON L1S 2J4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 683 2320
Extension: 11127
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Lakeridge Health Ajax Pickering
580 Harwood Ave S
Ajax Ontario L1S 2J4
Phone: (905) 683-2320
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site
LOCATION: Ajax

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Adam Heath Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Jul 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Heath (CPSO#: 98678 )
Business Address: 28 Thomas Avenue
Toronto Ontario M1C 1E5
Business Address: 1755 Pharmacy Ave
Scarborough ON M1T 1H4
Business Address: 580 Harwood Ave S
Ajax ON L1S 2J4
9056832320

Corporation Name: Norman Heath Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Sep 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Heath (CPSO#: 98678 ) Dr. N. Heath (CPSO#: 32478 )
Business Address: 6 - 122 Simcoe Street North
Oshawa Ontario L1G 4S4
(905) 728-7874
Business Address: 580 Harwood Avenue South
ER
Ajax Ontario L1S 2J4
(905) 683-2320
Business Address: 57 Hunter Street East
Peterborough Ontario K9H 1T6

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 580 Harwood Ave S
Ajax ON L1S 2J4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 683 2320
Extension: 11127
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Lakeridge Health Ajax Pickering
580 Harwood Ave S
Ajax Ontario L1S 2J4
Phone: (905) 683-2320
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site
LOCATION: Ajax

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Adam Heath Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Jul 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Heath (CPSO#: 98678 )
Business Address: 28 Thomas Avenue
Toronto Ontario M1C 1E5
Business Address: 1755 Pharmacy Ave
Scarborough ON M1T 1H4
Business Address: 580 Harwood Ave S
Ajax ON L1S 2J4
9056832320

Corporation Name: Norman Heath Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Sep 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Heath (CPSO#: 98678 ) Dr. N. Heath (CPSO#: 32478 )
Business Address: 6 - 122 Simcoe Street North
Oshawa Ontario L1G 4S4
(905) 728-7874
Business Address: 580 Harwood Avenue South
ER
Ajax Ontario L1S 2J4
(905) 683-2320
Business Address: 57 Hunter Street East
Peterborough Ontario K9H 1T6

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PETER ADAM HEATH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HEATH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PETER ADAM HEATH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HEATH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Calgary, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 May 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 May 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012