THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:35:25 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Dublin Trinity College, 2012
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit G14
1455 Lakeshore Road
Burlington Ontario L7S 2J1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 631-8787
Fax: (905) 631-8786

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
HOSPITAL: Joseph Brant Hospital
LOCATION: Burlington

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Elizabeth Markowski Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Apr 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Markowski (CPSO#: 98705 )
Business Address: Suite G14
1455 Lakeshore Road
Burlington Ontario L7S 2J1

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Dublin Trinity College, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit G14
1455 Lakeshore Road
Burlington Ontario L7S 2J1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 631-8787
Fax: (905) 631-8786

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
HOSPITAL: Joseph Brant Hospital
LOCATION: Burlington

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Elizabeth Markowski Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Apr 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Markowski (CPSO#: 98705 )
Business Address: Suite G14
1455 Lakeshore Road
Burlington Ontario L7S 2J1

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ELIZABETH ANNE MARKOWSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARKOWSKI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ELIZABETH ANNE MARKOWSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARKOWSKI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Dublin Trinity College, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2017

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Sep 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012