THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:20:08 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2012
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Room E2-211
800 Commissioners Road East
P.O. Box 5010
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 685-8260
Fax: (519) 685-8378

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Colorectal Surgery
Effective: 24 Sep 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Colorectal Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 24 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre London
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Terry Zwiep Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Apr 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Zwiep (CPSO#: 98712 )
Business Address: 800 Commissioners Rd E
Room E2-211
P.O. BOX 5010
London ON N6A 5W9
5196858260

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Room E2-211
800 Commissioners Road East
P.O. Box 5010
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 685-8260
Fax: (519) 685-8378

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Colorectal Surgery
Effective: 24 Sep 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Colorectal Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 24 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre London
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Terry Zwiep Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Apr 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Zwiep (CPSO#: 98712 )
Business Address: 800 Commissioners Rd E
Room E2-211
P.O. BOX 5010
London ON N6A 5W9
5196858260

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TERRY MURRAY ZWIEP may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZWIEP is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TERRY MURRAY ZWIEP may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZWIEP is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jun 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012