THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 06:16:25 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Jagiellonian University Medical College, 2011
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, POLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Eastern Ontario Regional
Laboratory Association
The Ottawa Hospital, General Campus
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-737-8899
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anatomical Pathology
Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anatomical Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Paul Borowy-Borowski Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Borowy-Borowski (CPSO#: 98730 )
Business Address: Brant Community Healthcare System
Department of Laboratory Medicine
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford Ontario N3R 1G9
(519) 751-5544
Business Address: Eastern Ontario Regional Laboratory Association
The Ottawa Hospital, General Campus
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
(613) 737-8899
Business Address: Trillium Health Partners
Department of Laboratory Medicine
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
(905) 813-2696
Business Address: Cambridge Memorial Hospital
700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge Ontario N1R 3G2
(519) 621-2330

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, POLISH
Medical School: Jagiellonian University Medical College, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Eastern Ontario Regional
Laboratory Association
The Ottawa Hospital, General Campus
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-737-8899
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anatomical Pathology
Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anatomical Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Paul Borowy-Borowski Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Borowy-Borowski (CPSO#: 98730 )
Business Address: Brant Community Healthcare System
Department of Laboratory Medicine
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford Ontario N3R 1G9
(519) 751-5544
Business Address: Eastern Ontario Regional Laboratory Association
The Ottawa Hospital, General Campus
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
(613) 737-8899
Business Address: Trillium Health Partners
Department of Laboratory Medicine
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
(905) 813-2696
Business Address: Cambridge Memorial Hospital
700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge Ontario N1R 3G2
(519) 621-2330

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PAUL GEORGE BOROWY-BOROWSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOROWY-BOROWSKI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PAUL GEORGE BOROWY-BOROWSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOROWY-BOROWSKI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Jagiellonian University Medical College, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2017

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Sep 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012