THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
27/04/25 14:13:07 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Wayne State University School of Medicine, 2012
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 565 Sanatorium Rd
Escarpment Health
Suite 101
Hamilton ON L9C 7N4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-318-0303
Fax: 905-318-3050
Address: 280 Queenston Rd
Hamilton Ontario L8K 1H1
Phone: (905) 318-0303
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Dec 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 16 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ilango Thirumoorthi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. I. Thirumoorthi (CPSO#: 98731 ) Dr. S. Sharma (CPSO#: 90535 )
Business Address: 565 Sanatorium Road
Suite 101
Hamilton Ontario L9C 5K8
289-309-2119

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Wayne State University School of Medicine, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 565 Sanatorium Rd
Escarpment Health
Suite 101
Hamilton ON L9C 7N4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-318-0303
Fax: 905-318-3050
Address: 280 Queenston Rd
Hamilton Ontario L8K 1H1
Phone: (905) 318-0303
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Dec 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 16 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ilango Thirumoorthi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. I. Thirumoorthi (CPSO#: 98731 ) Dr. S. Sharma (CPSO#: 90535 )
Business Address: 565 Sanatorium Road
Suite 101
Hamilton Ontario L9C 5K8
289-309-2119

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ILANGO VELAN THIRUMOORTHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THIRUMOORTHI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ILANGO VELAN THIRUMOORTHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THIRUMOORTHI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Wayne State University School of Medicine, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jan 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jan 2015

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012