THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 04:37:34 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Isfahan University, 1999
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 8-9019 Bayview Ave
Richmond Hill ON L4B 3M6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9058869660
Fax: 9058869664
Address: 100-701 Main St W
Hamilton ON L8S 1A2
Phone: 2897687246
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2-6981 Millcreek Dr
Mississauga ON L5N 6B8
Phone: 2897247246
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 133 Broadway
Orangeville ON L9W 1K2
Phone: 2267807246
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 23 Jun 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 23 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. S. Azimzadeh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 May 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Azimzadeh (CPSO#: 98741 )
Business Address: 1 - 33 Broad Way
Orangeville Ontario L9W 1J7
(226) 780-7246
Business Address: 2 - 6981 Millcreek Drive
Mississauga Ontario L5N 6B8
(289) 724-7246
Business Address: 100 - 701 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8S 1A2
(289) 768-7246
Business Address: W C O B
Unit 8
9019 Bayview Avenue
Richmond Hill Ontario L4B 3M6
(905) 886-9660
Business Address: 1 - 245 Wyecroft Road
Oakville Ontario L6K 3Y6
(289) 817-7246

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI
Medical School: Isfahan University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 8-9019 Bayview Ave
Richmond Hill ON L4B 3M6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9058869660
Fax: 9058869664
Address: 100-701 Main St W
Hamilton ON L8S 1A2
Phone: 2897687246
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2-6981 Millcreek Dr
Mississauga ON L5N 6B8
Phone: 2897247246
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 133 Broadway
Orangeville ON L9W 1K2
Phone: 2267807246
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 23 Jun 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 23 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. S. Azimzadeh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 May 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Azimzadeh (CPSO#: 98741 )
Business Address: 1 - 33 Broad Way
Orangeville Ontario L9W 1J7
(226) 780-7246
Business Address: 2 - 6981 Millcreek Drive
Mississauga Ontario L5N 6B8
(289) 724-7246
Business Address: 100 - 701 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8S 1A2
(289) 768-7246
Business Address: W C O B
Unit 8
9019 Bayview Avenue
Richmond Hill Ontario L4B 3M6
(905) 886-9660
Business Address: 1 - 245 Wyecroft Road
Oakville Ontario L6K 3Y6
(289) 817-7246

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHAHNAZ AZIMZADEH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AZIMZADEH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHAHNAZ AZIMZADEH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AZIMZADEH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Isfahan University, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jun 2014

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012