THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 04:15:54 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Iran Univ.of Med Sciences & Hlth Service, 2003
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: unit 15 level 2-9080 Yonge Street
Ahadian Eye Institute
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 0Y7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-707-9333
Fax: 289-870-2627
Address: 9080 Yonge Street
Grand Genesis Health
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 0Y7
Phone: 289-597-7676
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 07 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 07 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Iran

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ali Ahadian Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Sep 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Ahadian (CPSO#: 98745 )
Business Address: Unit 15 - 9080 Yonge St.
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C0Y7
289-597-7676 Extn: 4
Business Address: 12-9080 Yonge Street
Level 2
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 0Y7
(289) 597-7676

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI
Medical School: Iran Univ.of Med Sciences & Hlth Service, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: unit 15 level 2-9080 Yonge Street
Ahadian Eye Institute
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 0Y7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-707-9333
Fax: 289-870-2627
Address: 9080 Yonge Street
Grand Genesis Health
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 0Y7
Phone: 289-597-7676
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 07 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 07 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Iran

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ali Ahadian Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Sep 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Ahadian (CPSO#: 98745 )
Business Address: Unit 15 - 9080 Yonge St.
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C0Y7
289-597-7676 Extn: 4
Business Address: 12-9080 Yonge Street
Level 2
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 0Y7
(289) 597-7676

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALI AHADIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AHADIAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALI AHADIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AHADIAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Iran Univ.of Med Sciences & Hlth Service, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Dec 2018
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Aug 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 2018

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012