THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 06:28:30 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2012
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3200 Major Mackenzie Dr
Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital
Woman and Child Program
Maple ON L6A 4Z3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 417-2000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 30 Prospect Street
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 3S9
Phone: (905) 235-7284
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Mackenzie Health
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 4Z3
Phone: (905) 883-1212
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 28 Jul 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 28 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Filippe Scerbo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Dec 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Scerbo (CPSO#: 98752 )
Business Address: Mackenzie Health
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 4Z3
(905) 883-1212
Business Address: 30 Prospect Street
Suite 200
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 3S9
(905) 235-7284

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3200 Major Mackenzie Dr
Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital
Woman and Child Program
Maple ON L6A 4Z3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 417-2000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 30 Prospect Street
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 3S9
Phone: (905) 235-7284
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Mackenzie Health
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 4Z3
Phone: (905) 883-1212
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 28 Jul 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 28 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Filippe Scerbo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Dec 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Scerbo (CPSO#: 98752 )
Business Address: Mackenzie Health
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 4Z3
(905) 883-1212
Business Address: 30 Prospect Street
Suite 200
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 3S9
(905) 235-7284

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FILIPPE ROSS SCERBO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCERBO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FILIPPE ROSS SCERBO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCERBO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Aug 2016

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012