THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
26/05/25 05:05:35 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: The Medical College of Wisconsin, 2012
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, TAMIL

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Michael Garron Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4C 3E7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 461-8272
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Trillium Health Centre
Department of Emergency Medicine
100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
Phone: (905) 848-7100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 09 Dec 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 23 Jun 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 23 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. Balachandran Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Jan 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Balachandran (CPSO#: 98759 )
Business Address: Michael Garron Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4C 3E7
(416) 461-8272
Business Address: 100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
(905) 848-7100

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, TAMIL
Medical School: The Medical College of Wisconsin, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Michael Garron Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4C 3E7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 461-8272
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Trillium Health Centre
Department of Emergency Medicine
100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
Phone: (905) 848-7100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 09 Dec 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 23 Jun 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 23 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. Balachandran Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Jan 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Balachandran (CPSO#: 98759 )
Business Address: Michael Garron Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4C 3E7
(416) 461-8272
Business Address: 100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
(905) 848-7100

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ARAN BALACHANDRAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BALACHANDRAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ARAN BALACHANDRAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BALACHANDRAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: The Medical College of Wisconsin, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 May 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 May 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012