THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 02:50:04 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2012
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Urgent Care Centre
25 Woodbine Downs Blvd. Unit 10
Toronto, ON
M9W 6N5
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-741-2273
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Greenwood Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 May 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Greenwood (CPSO#: 98761 )
Business Address: 25 Woodbine Downs Blvd
suite 10
Etobicoke ON M9W 6N5
4165549083

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Urgent Care Centre
25 Woodbine Downs Blvd. Unit 10
Toronto, ON
M9W 6N5
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-741-2273
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Greenwood Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 May 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Greenwood (CPSO#: 98761 )
Business Address: 25 Woodbine Downs Blvd
suite 10
Etobicoke ON M9W 6N5
4165549083

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALLEN DAVID GREENWOOD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GREENWOOD is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALLEN DAVID GREENWOOD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GREENWOOD is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Jul 2014

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012