THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 06:42:36 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 2012
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Pediatric Health Experts
30 Prospect Street, Suite 200
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 3S9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-235-7284
Fax: 905-235-7320
Address: Southlake Regional Health Center
Department of Pediatrics
596 Davis Dr
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
Phone: 905-895-4521
Extension: 2617
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Madeline Drake Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Oct 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Drake (CPSO#: 98764 )
Business Address: Southlake Regional Health Centre
Department of Pediatrics
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
(905) 895-4521 Extn: 2617
Business Address: Pediatrics Health Experts
200 - 30 Prospect Street
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 3S9
(905) 235-7284

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Pediatric Health Experts
30 Prospect Street, Suite 200
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 3S9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-235-7284
Fax: 905-235-7320
Address: Southlake Regional Health Center
Department of Pediatrics
596 Davis Dr
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
Phone: 905-895-4521
Extension: 2617
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Madeline Drake Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Oct 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Drake (CPSO#: 98764 )
Business Address: Southlake Regional Health Centre
Department of Pediatrics
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
(905) 895-4521 Extn: 2617
Business Address: Pediatrics Health Experts
200 - 30 Prospect Street
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 3S9
(905) 235-7284

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MADELINE JANE DRAKE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DRAKE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MADELINE JANE DRAKE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DRAKE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jan 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jan 2017

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012