THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
25/05/25 04:31:31 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Spartan Health Sciences University, 2010
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, SINDHI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 150 Sherway Drive
Trillium Health Partners - Queensway Health Centre
Toronto Ontario M9C 1A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-259-7580
Fax: 416-521-4072

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Geriatric Psychiatry
Effective: 26 Sep 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Geriatric Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
University Health Network Toronto
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: University Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: P. K. Babani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Jun 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Babani (CPSO#: 98766 )
Business Address: 225-Bristol Road East
Mississauga Ontario L4Z 3K8
905-494-2120 Extn: 50020

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, SINDHI
Medical School: Spartan Health Sciences University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 150 Sherway Drive
Trillium Health Partners - Queensway Health Centre
Toronto Ontario M9C 1A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-259-7580
Fax: 416-521-4072

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Geriatric Psychiatry
Effective: 26 Sep 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Geriatric Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
University Health Network Toronto
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: University Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: P. K. Babani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Jun 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Babani (CPSO#: 98766 )
Business Address: 225-Bristol Road East
Mississauga Ontario L4Z 3K8
905-494-2120 Extn: 50020

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PRAKASH KISHOR BABANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BABANI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PRAKASH KISHOR BABANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BABANI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Spartan Health Sciences University, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 07 Apr 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 01 Feb 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2017

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2017

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 07 Apr 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 01 Feb 2017

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Feb 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Feb 2017

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Sep 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012