THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 06:33:55 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Albany Medical College of Union Univ, 2012
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 699 Concession St
Hamilton ON L8V 5C2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Radiation Oncology
Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Radiation Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: EK DONOVAN MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Oct 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Donovan (CPSO#: 98772 )
Business Address: 699 Concession Street
Hamilton Ontario L8V 4X2
905-387-9495 Extn: 63123

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Albany Medical College of Union Univ, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 699 Concession St
Hamilton ON L8V 5C2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Radiation Oncology
Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Radiation Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: EK DONOVAN MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Oct 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Donovan (CPSO#: 98772 )
Business Address: 699 Concession Street
Hamilton Ontario L8V 4X2
905-387-9495 Extn: 63123

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ELYSIA KATHLEEN DONOVAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DONOVAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ELYSIA KATHLEEN DONOVAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DONOVAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Albany Medical College of Union Univ, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 May 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 May 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012