THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
25/05/25 03:51:43 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1994
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 136 Orton Park Rd
unit 2
Scarborough ON M1G 3H1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-420-9111
Fax: 289-733-2766
Address: 1885 Glenanna Rd
unit 110
Pickering ON L1V 6R6
Phone: 905-420-9111
Fax: 289-733-2766

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Dec 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 16 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: G. El Mokadem Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Dec 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. G. El Mokadem (CPSO#: 98787 )
Business Address: 1235 Bayly St, unit 4
Pickering ON L1W 1L7
9054927881
Business Address: 110-1885 Glenanna Rd
Pickering ON L1V 6R6
6476846111

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 136 Orton Park Rd
unit 2
Scarborough ON M1G 3H1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-420-9111
Fax: 289-733-2766
Address: 1885 Glenanna Rd
unit 110
Pickering ON L1V 6R6
Phone: 905-420-9111
Fax: 289-733-2766

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Dec 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 16 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: G. El Mokadem Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Dec 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. G. El Mokadem (CPSO#: 98787 )
Business Address: 1235 Bayly St, unit 4
Pickering ON L1W 1L7
9054927881
Business Address: 110-1885 Glenanna Rd
Pickering ON L1V 6R6
6476846111

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GIHAN SALAH EL DIN EL MOKADEM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EL MOKADEM is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GIHAN SALAH EL DIN EL MOKADEM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EL MOKADEM is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jan 2015

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2014

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012