THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 04:11:19 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University College, Cork, 2012
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1615 Dundas Street East
Ontario Shores Mental Health Sciences Centre
Durham Community Clinic
306
Whitby Ontario L1N 2L1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-430-4055
Extension: 6108
Fax: 905-432-4411

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ontario Shores Centre for Mental Health Sciences Whitby
HOSPITAL: Ontario Shores Centre for Mental Health Sciences
LOCATION: Whitby

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Carol Tse Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Jul 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Tse (CPSO#: 98802 )
Business Address: Ontario Shores Centre for Mental Health Science
700 Gordon Street
Suite 2-2012
Whitby Ontario L1N 5S9
(905) 430-4055 Extn: 6108

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University College, Cork, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1615 Dundas Street East
Ontario Shores Mental Health Sciences Centre
Durham Community Clinic
306
Whitby Ontario L1N 2L1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-430-4055
Extension: 6108
Fax: 905-432-4411

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ontario Shores Centre for Mental Health Sciences Whitby
HOSPITAL: Ontario Shores Centre for Mental Health Sciences
LOCATION: Whitby

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Carol Tse Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Jul 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Tse (CPSO#: 98802 )
Business Address: Ontario Shores Centre for Mental Health Science
700 Gordon Street
Suite 2-2012
Whitby Ontario L1N 5S9
(905) 430-4055 Extn: 6108

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CAROL KAR LOONG TSE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TSE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CAROL KAR LOONG TSE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TSE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University College, Cork, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2017

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012