THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:30:51 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Universidad Libre de Colombia, 2005
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 300 Rossland Rd E
One Health
suite 204
Ajax ON L1Z 0M1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-239-7663
Fax: 905-239-2900

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 03 Nov 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 01 Aug 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 03 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 01 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Unity Health Toronto Toronto
Kensington Eye Institute Toronto
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
HOSPITAL: Unity Health Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Kensington Eye Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH
Medical School: Universidad Libre de Colombia, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 300 Rossland Rd E
One Health
suite 204
Ajax ON L1Z 0M1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-239-7663
Fax: 905-239-2900

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 03 Nov 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 01 Aug 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 03 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 01 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Unity Health Toronto Toronto
Kensington Eye Institute Toronto
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
HOSPITAL: Unity Health Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Kensington Eye Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VANESSA OCAMPO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OCAMPO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VANESSA OCAMPO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OCAMPO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Universidad Libre de Colombia, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Nov 2018
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Nov 2018

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Sep 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012