THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:25:20 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2012
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Block Line Medical Clinic
1450 Block Line Road
Suite 201
Kitchener Ontario N2C 0A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 578-4450
Fax: (519) 579-1142

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gillian Hewson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Sep 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Hewson (CPSO#: 98820 )
Business Address: 201-1450 Block Line Rd
Kitchener ON N2C 0A5

Corporation Name: Gillian Hewson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 10 Nov 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Block Line Medical Clinic
1450 Block Line Road
Suite 201
Kitchener Ontario N2C 0A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 578-4450
Fax: (519) 579-1142

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gillian Hewson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Sep 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Hewson (CPSO#: 98820 )
Business Address: 201-1450 Block Line Rd
Kitchener ON N2C 0A5

Corporation Name: Gillian Hewson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 10 Nov 2022

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GILLIAN LOUISE HEWSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HEWSON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GILLIAN LOUISE HEWSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HEWSON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Aug 2014

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012