THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:35:41 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University College of Dublin, 2012
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CROATIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Trillium Health Partners
Credit Valley Hospital
Suite 510
2300 Eglinton Ave. West.
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2V8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 997-2015
Fax: (905) 997-2020
Address: 750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste. Marie Ontario P6B 0A8
Phone: (705) 759 - 34
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 06 Nov 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 06 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste. Marie
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Sault Area Hospital
LOCATION: Sault Ste. Marie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Karlo Hockmann Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Aug 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Hockmann (CPSO#: 98828 )
Business Address: Sault Area Hospital
Department of Medicine
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste. Marie Ontario K7L 2V7
(705) 759-3434
Business Address: Trillium Health Partners
The Credit Valley Hospital
2300 Eglinton Avenue West
Suite 510
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2V8

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CROATIAN
Medical School: University College of Dublin, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Trillium Health Partners
Credit Valley Hospital
Suite 510
2300 Eglinton Ave. West.
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2V8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 997-2015
Fax: (905) 997-2020
Address: 750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste. Marie Ontario P6B 0A8
Phone: (705) 759 - 34
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 06 Nov 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 06 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste. Marie
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Sault Area Hospital
LOCATION: Sault Ste. Marie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Karlo Hockmann Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Aug 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Hockmann (CPSO#: 98828 )
Business Address: Sault Area Hospital
Department of Medicine
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste. Marie Ontario K7L 2V7
(705) 759-3434
Business Address: Trillium Health Partners
The Credit Valley Hospital
2300 Eglinton Avenue West
Suite 510
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2V8

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KARLO HOCKMANN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOCKMANN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KARLO HOCKMANN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOCKMANN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University College of Dublin, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2016

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Sep 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012