THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:08:34 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2012
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, KOREAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: One Heart Care
1000 Middlegate Rd, 2nd floor
Mississauga ON L4Y 1M3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9058047000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 18 Oct 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 18 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Hanna Lee Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Jun 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Lee (CPSO#: 98916 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, KOREAN
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: One Heart Care
1000 Middlegate Rd, 2nd floor
Mississauga ON L4Y 1M3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9058047000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 18 Oct 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 18 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Hanna Lee Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Jun 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Lee (CPSO#: 98916 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HANNA LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HANNA LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Nov 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Nov 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012