THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:12:03 AM

General Information

Former Name: Grably, Melissa (Used Until: 15 Jan 2024)
Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 2012
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Glengarry Memorial Hospital
20260 County Road 43
Alexandria Ontario K0C 1A0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 525-2324
Fax: (613) 525-0159

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 27 Jun 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 27 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hopital Glengarry Memorial Hospital Alexandria
HOSPITAL: Hopital Glengarry Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Alexandria

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Melissa Rivest-Gaudreault Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Rivest-Gaudreault (CPSO#: 98919 )
Business Address: 20260 County Road 43
Alexandria Ontario K0C 1A0
(613) 525-2324

General Information

Former Name: Grably, Melissa (Used Until: 15 Jan 2024)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Glengarry Memorial Hospital
20260 County Road 43
Alexandria Ontario K0C 1A0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 525-2324
Fax: (613) 525-0159

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 27 Jun 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 27 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hopital Glengarry Memorial Hospital Alexandria
HOSPITAL: Hopital Glengarry Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Alexandria

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Melissa Rivest-Gaudreault Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Rivest-Gaudreault (CPSO#: 98919 )
Business Address: 20260 County Road 43
Alexandria Ontario K0C 1A0
(613) 525-2324

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MELISSA RIVEST-GAUDREAULT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RIVEST-GAUDREAULT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MELISSA RIVEST-GAUDREAULT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RIVEST-GAUDREAULT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012