THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 03:44:54 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2012
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 600 University Ave
Mount Sinai Hospital
Emergency Associates
2B - 213
Toronto ON M5G 1X5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4165865058
Fax: 4165864719

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 19 Oct 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 19 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Qassim Z Tejpar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Jun 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. Q. Tejpar (CPSO#: 99009 )
Business Address: 600 University Ave
Mount Sinai Hospital
Emergency Associates
Suite 2B - 213
Toronto ON M5G 1X5
4165865058
Business Address: Mount Sinai Hospital
206 - 600 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
(416) 586-5058

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 600 University Ave
Mount Sinai Hospital
Emergency Associates
2B - 213
Toronto ON M5G 1X5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4165865058
Fax: 4165864719

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 19 Oct 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 19 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Qassim Z Tejpar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Jun 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. Q. Tejpar (CPSO#: 99009 )
Business Address: 600 University Ave
Mount Sinai Hospital
Emergency Associates
Suite 2B - 213
Toronto ON M5G 1X5
4165865058
Business Address: Mount Sinai Hospital
206 - 600 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
(416) 586-5058

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. QASSIM ZAVHAR TEJPAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TEJPAR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. QASSIM ZAVHAR TEJPAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TEJPAR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012