THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:58:55 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Sheffield University School of Medicine and Biomedical Sciences, 2006
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, TAMIL

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 201
1371 Neilson Road
Scarborough Ontario M1B 4Z8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 282-9198
Fax: (416) 282-9897

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatric Cardiology
Effective: 01 Jul 2013
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatric Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
Humber River Hospital Toronto
Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
North York General Hospital Toronto
Oak Valley Health Markham
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site
LOCATION: Ajax

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Selvi Senthilnathan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Feb 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Senthilnathan (CPSO#: 99029 )
Business Address: Humber River Regional Hospital
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto Ontario M3M 0B2
(416) 242-1000
Business Address: Suite 409
1371 Neilson Road
Toronto Ontario M1B 4Z8
(416) 282-9198
Business Address: The Scarborough Hospital
Birchmount Site
3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough Ontario M1W 3W3
(416) 495-2400
Business Address: Rouge Valley Health Centre
2867 Ellesmere Road
Toronto Ontario M1E 4B9
(416) 284-8131
Business Address: North Etobicoke Children's Clinic
103 - 40 Westmore Drive
Etobicoke Ontario M9V 4C2
(416) 745-4050
Business Address: Markham Stouffville Hospital
381 Church Street
Markham Ontario L3P 7P3
(905) 472-7000
Business Address: Lakeridge Health System
Ajax-Pickering Site
580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax Ontario L1S 2J4
(905) 683-2320
Business Address: North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto Ontario M2K 1E1
(416) 756-6000

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, TAMIL
Medical School: Sheffield University School of Medicine and Biomedical Sciences, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 201
1371 Neilson Road
Scarborough Ontario M1B 4Z8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 282-9198
Fax: (416) 282-9897

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatric Cardiology
Effective: 01 Jul 2013
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatric Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
Humber River Hospital Toronto
Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
North York General Hospital Toronto
Oak Valley Health Markham
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site
LOCATION: Ajax

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Selvi Senthilnathan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Feb 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Senthilnathan (CPSO#: 99029 )
Business Address: Humber River Regional Hospital
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto Ontario M3M 0B2
(416) 242-1000
Business Address: Suite 409
1371 Neilson Road
Toronto Ontario M1B 4Z8
(416) 282-9198
Business Address: The Scarborough Hospital
Birchmount Site
3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough Ontario M1W 3W3
(416) 495-2400
Business Address: Rouge Valley Health Centre
2867 Ellesmere Road
Toronto Ontario M1E 4B9
(416) 284-8131
Business Address: North Etobicoke Children's Clinic
103 - 40 Westmore Drive
Etobicoke Ontario M9V 4C2
(416) 745-4050
Business Address: Markham Stouffville Hospital
381 Church Street
Markham Ontario L3P 7P3
(905) 472-7000
Business Address: Lakeridge Health System
Ajax-Pickering Site
580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax Ontario L1S 2J4
(905) 683-2320
Business Address: North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto Ontario M2K 1E1
(416) 756-6000

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
23 Jul 2015
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jul 23 2015
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Selvi Senthilnathan may practise medicine independently in paediatric
cardiology.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Selvi Senthilnathan may practise medicine independently in paediatric
cardiology.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Sheffield University School of Medicine and Biomedical Sciences, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 23 Jul 2015
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 23 Jul 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 18 Jun 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 13 Nov 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 13 Mar 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 23 Jul 2015

DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 23 Jul 2015

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 18 Jun 2015

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 13 Nov 2014

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 13 Mar 2014

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Jul 2012